Docket for 22-121
 | |
|
May 19 2022 | Application (21A757) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 8, 2022 to August 7, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 23 2022 | Application (21A757) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 7, 2022. | | | Aug 05 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 15 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, ML Genius Holdings LLC | | Blanket ConsentProof of Service | Aug 31 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 7, 2022, for all respondents. | | | Sep 08 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Open Markets Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 08 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Digital Justice Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 07 2022 | Brief of respondents Google LLC, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 18 2022 | Reply of petitioner ML Genius Holdings LLC filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022. | | | Dec 12 2022 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | |
|