SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-1170
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-1170
Title:
335-7 LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of New York, New York, et al.
Docketed:
June 2, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-823)
Decision Date:
March 1, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 30 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 3, 2023)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 12 2023
Motion of RuthAnne Visnauskas to extend the time to file a response from July 3, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 13 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2023, for all respondents.
Jun 13 2023
Brief amicus curiae of Alexander Gallo filed. ( also in 22-1095, 22-1130) VIDED.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2023
Brief of respondent RuthAnne Visnauskas, Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 21 2023
Brief of respondents City of New York and New York City Rent Guidelines Board in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023
Brief of respondents N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors and Community Voices Heard in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Sep 06 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 06 2023
Reply of petitioners 335-7 LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 23 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 06 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023
Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Justin Cooper
Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036
ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: 335-7 LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
RDEARING@LAW.NYC.GOV
2123562500
Party name: City of New York, New York City Rent Guidelines Board
Faith Elizabeth Gay
Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
17th Floor
New York, NY 10104
fgay@selendygay.com
2123909001
Party name: N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors, Community Voices Heard
Barbara Dale Underwood
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400
BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: RuthAnne Visnauskas, Commissioner of New York State Homes and Community Renewal
Other
Saeid Baradaran Amini
Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Saeid B. Amini
730 24th Street, NW
Suite One
Washington, DC 20037
sbajd98@yahoo.com
2023069444
Party name: Alexander Gallo
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##