Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1125
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1125
Title:Don Blankenship, Petitioner
v.
NBCUniversal, LLC, et al.
Docketed:May 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1198, 22-1207, 22-1326)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 13 2023Waiver of right of respondent Boston Globe Media Partners LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2023Waiver of right of respondents NBCUniversal, LLC; CNBC, LLC; Fox News Network, LLC; Cable News Network, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jul 11 2023Response Requested. (Due August 10, 2023)
Jul 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2023 to August 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2023, for all respondents.
Aug 21 2023Brief of respondents NBCUniversal, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2023Reply of petitioner Don Blankenship filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Peter Early
    Counsel of Record
Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP
6420 Wilshire Blvd.
17th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90048

EEARLY@EARLYSULLIVAN.COM
3233014660
Party name: Don Blankenship
Attorneys for Respondents
Kevin Taylor Baine
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20024

kbaine@wc.com
202-434-5011
Party name: NBCUniversal, LLC; CNBC, LLC; Fox News Network, LLC; Cable News Network, Inc., et al.
Andrew Martin ButtaroMorgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110-1726

andrew.buttaro@morganlewis.com
617-341-7743
Party name: Boston Globe Media Partners LLC
Jonathan M. Albano
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110

jonathan.albano@morganlewis.com
617-341-7700
Party name: Boston Globe Media Partners LLC
Other
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
703 356 5070
Party name: Free Speech Coalition, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543