SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-1074
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-1074
Title:
George Sheetz, Petitioner
v.
County of El Dorado, California
Docketed:
May 4, 2023
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
Case Numbers:
(C093682)
Decision Date:
October 19, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
February 1, 2023
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 02 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023)
Petition
Appendix
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 26 2023
Motion of County of El Dorado for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul J. Beard II
Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027
PAUL.BEARD@FISHERBROYLES.COM
818-216-3988
Party name: George Sheetz
Attorneys for Respondent
Glen Calvin Hansen
Counsel of Record
Abbott & Kindermann, Inc.
2100 21st Street, Ste. A
Sacramento, CA 95818
ghansen@aklandlaw.com
9164569595
Party name: County of El Dorado
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##