Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1071
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1071
Title:Washington Alliance of Technology Workers, Petitioner
v.
Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:May 4, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-5028)
   Decision Date:October 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 1, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2023 to July 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2023.
May 30 2023Motion of respondents National Association of Manufacturers, et al. to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2023 to July 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2023, for all respondents.
Jun 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Immigration Studies filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2023Brief amici curiae of 31 Members of the United States House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2023Brief amici curiae of Kansas and 10 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2023Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Ted Cruz, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 26 2023Motion of respondents National Association of Manufacturers, et al. to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2023 to August 4, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 4, 2023, for all respondents.
Aug 04 2023Brief of respondents Department of Homeland Security, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 04 2023Brief of respondents National Association of Manufacturers, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 05 2023Reply of petitioner Washington Alliance of Technology Workers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Michael Miano
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

MIANO@COLOSSEUMBUILDERS.COM
(202) 232-5590
Party name: Washington Alliance of Technology Workers
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHUGHES@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8000
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and the Information Technology Industry Council
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Other
Julie B. Axelrod
    Counsel of Record
Center for Immigration Studies
1629 K Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

jba@cis.org
2024668185
Party name: Center for Immigration Studies
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Joseph Benjamin Edlow
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Joseph Edlow LLC
1201 Seven Locks Road, Suite 360
Rockville, MD 20854

joseph@edlowlaw.com
4103031450
Party name: 31 Members of the United States House of Representatives
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

MCCOTTER@BOYDENGRAYASSOCIATES.COM
202-706-5488
Party name: U.S. Senators Ted Cruz, Mike Lee, Tom Cotton, Mike Braun & Katie Boyd Britt
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

MIKE@LANDMARKLEGAL.ORG
703-554-6105
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Anthony John Powell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kansas Attomey General
120 SW 10th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

ANTHONY.POWELL@AG.KS.GOV
785296-2215
Party name: Kansas and 10 Other States
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543