Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1038
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1038
Title:Hector Gonzalez-Rivas, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:April 25, 2023
Linked with 22A736
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3364)
   Decision Date:November 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Feb 08 2023Application (22A736) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 21, 2023 to April 21, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Feb 10 2023Application (22A736) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 21, 2023.
Apr 21 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2023)
May 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2023 to June 26, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
May 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 26, 2023.
Jun 26 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed.
Jun 28 2023Reply of petitioner Hector Gonzalez-Rivas filed.
Jul 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHUGHES@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Hector Gonzalez-Rivas
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick B.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543