Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-10
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-10
Title:David Fox Dubin, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 5, 2022
Linked with 21A694
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50912)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 05 2022Application (21A694) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2022 to July 31, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 11 2022Application (21A694) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 1, 2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 4, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 4, 2022 to September 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 6, 2022.
Aug 02 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2022 to September 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 8, 2022.
Sep 08 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Sep 28 2022Reply of David Dubin submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clini
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: David Dubin
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Henry W. Asbill
    Counsel of Record
Buckley LLP
2001 M St. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

hasbill@buckleyfirm.com
202-349-8000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543