Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21M31
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21M31
Title:Dakota Access, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5197, 20-5201)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Motion (21M31) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Sep 29 2021MOTION (21M31) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Motion (21M31) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. Justice Alito and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Dakota Access, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543