Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A90
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A90
Title:John Does 1-3, et al., Applicants
v.
Janet T. Mills, Governor of Maine, et al.
Docketed:October 20, 2021
Linked with 21-717
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1826)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2021Application (21A90) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 20 2021Response to application (21A90) requested by Justice Breyer, due Monday, October 25, by noon.
Oct 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by religious and civil rights organizations.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Response to application from respondents MaineHealth, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 25 2021Response to application from respondents Janet T. Mills, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Reply of applicants John Does 1-3, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Public Health Associates and Scholars.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 29 2021Application (21A90) referred to the Court.
Oct 29 2021Application (21A90) denied by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to JUSTICE BREYER and by him referred to the Court is denied. JUSTICE BARRETT, with whom JUSTICE KAVANAUGH joins, concurring in the denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion). JUSTICE GORSUCH, with whom JUSTICE THOMAS and JUSTICE ALITO join, dissenting from the denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondents
Nolan Ladislav Reichl
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Atwood LLP
Merrill's Wharf, 254 Commercial Street
Portland, ME 04101

nreichl@pierceatwood.com
207-791-1304
Party name: MaineHealth, Genesis HealthCare of Maine, LLC, Genesis Healthcare, LLC, MaineGeneral Health
Kimberly Leehaug Patwardhan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Maine Attorney General
6 State House Station
Augusta, ME 04333

kimberly.patwardhan@maine.gov
2076268570
Party name: Janet T. Mills, Jeanne M. Lambrew, Nirav D. Shah
Nolan Ladislav Reichl
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Atwood LLP
Merrill's Wharf, 254 Commercial Street
Portland, ME 04101

nreichl@pierceatwood.com
207-791-1304
Party name: Northern Light Health Foundation
Other
Alexander J. Luchenitser
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

luchenitser@au.org
202-466-7306
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State; American Civil Liberties Union; American Civil Liberties Union of Maine; Disciples Center for Public Witness; Disciples Justice Action Network; Equal Partners in Faith; Global Justice Institute, Metropolitan Community Churches; Interfaith Alliance Foundation; Methodist Federation for Social Action; National Council of the Churches of Christ in the USA; National Council of Jewish Women; Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association.
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Public Health Associations and Scholars of Public Health

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543