Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A85
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A85
Title:United States, Applicant
v.
Texas, et al.
Docketed:October 18, 2021
Linked with 21-588
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-50949)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2021Application (21A85) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 18 2021Response to application (21A85) requested by Justice Alito, due Thursday, October 21, by noon ET.
Oct 18 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Massachusetts, et al.
Main DocumentOtherOther
Oct 18 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOtherProof of Service
Oct 19 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Civil Procedure Scholars.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 19 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Medical Organizations.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 19 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 19 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 19 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Scholars Leah Litman, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 20 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Texas Medical Association.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Oct 20 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Human Coalition, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Oct 21 2021Response to application from respondent Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 21 2021Response to application from Erick Graham, et al. filed.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Indiana, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Reply of applicant United States filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Application (21A85) referred to the Court.
Oct 22 2021Consideration of the application (21A85) to vacate stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. The application is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment (No. 21-588), and the petition is granted limited to the following question: May the United States bring suit in federal court and obtain injunctive or declaratory relief against the State, state court judges, state court clerks, other state officials, or all private parties to prohibit S.B. 8 from being enforced. The briefs of the parties in No. 21-588, limited to 13,000 words, are to be filed electronically on or before 5 p.m., Wednesday, October 27, 2021. Reply briefs, if any, limited to 6,000 words, are to be filed electronically on or before 5 p.m., Friday, October 29, 2021. Any amicus curiae briefs are to be filed electronically on or before 5 p.m., Wednesday, October 27, 2021. Booklet format briefs prepared in compliance with Rule 33.1 shall be submitted as soon as possible thereafter. The parties are not required to file a joint appendix. The case is set for oral argument on Monday, November 1, 2021. Justice Sotomayor, concurring in part and dissenting in part. (Detached opinion)
Oct 27 2021Main document of The Rogers Group not accepted for filing. (October 29, 2021)
Oct 28 2021Amicus of The Rogers Group not accepted for filing. (October 29, 2021)
Nov 01 202121-588 (21A85) Argued. For petitioner: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For state respondent: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex. For private respondents: Jonathan F. Mitchell, Austin, Tex.
Dec 10 2021The application to vacate stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. Justice Sotomayor would grant the application to vacate stay in No. 21A85 and dissents from the dismissal of No. 21-588 as improvidently granted. See No. 21-588.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas
Other
Amanda Stephanie Hainsworth
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

amanda.hainsworth@mass.gov
617-963-2618
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Planned Parenthood South Texas Surgical Center, Comprehensive Health of Planned Parenthood Great Plains, Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, and Planned Parenthood of The Rocky Mountains
Shannon Rose Selden
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 3rd Avenue
New York, NY 10022

srselden@debevoise.com
212-909-6000
Party name: Leading Medical Organizations
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Donald P. Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Texas Medical Assoc.
401 West 15th Street
10th Floor
Austin, TX 78701

rocky.wilcox@texmed.org
5123701336
Party name: Texas Medical Association
Sonya Diane Winner
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
415 Mission Street
Suite 4500
San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

swinner@cov.com
4155917072
Party name: Legal Scholars Leah Litman, Erwin Chemerinsky, Michael C. Dorf, Barry Friedman, and Fred O. Smith
Alison Beth Miller
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

amiller@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Civil Procedure Scholars
John P. Mastando III
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

john.mastando@weil.com
212.310.8064
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, and Former State Attorneys General, Federal and State Court Judges, U.S. Attorneys, and U.S. Department of Justice Officials
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Human Coalition and National Institute of Family & Life Advocates
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor, 302 W. Washington St.
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Utah, and West Virginia
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Erick Graham, Jeff Tuley, and Mistie Sharp
William Rogers Schlecht
    Counsel of Record
Rogers Schlecht, PLLC
14701 Front Beach Road
#2530
Panama City Beach, FL 32413

william.schlecht@att.net
2102168725
Party name: The Rogers Group

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543