Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A826
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A826
Title:Michigan State University, et al., Applicants
v.
Sophia Balow, et al.
Docketed:June 15, 2022
Linked with 22-93
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1183)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 10 2022Application (21A826) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 29, 2022 to July 29, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Application (21A826) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 29, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Michigan State University, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543