Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A814
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A814
Title:Kyle Ardoin, Secretary of State of Louisiana, et al., Applicants
v.
Press Robinson, et al.
Docketed:June 17, 2022
Linked with 21-1596
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-30333)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 17 2022Application (21A814) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Response to application (21A814) requested by Justice Alito, due 5 p.m. (EDT), June 23, 2022.
Jun 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Alabama and 12 other states.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 20 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Applicants filed by National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 22 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Members of U.S. House of Representatives from Louisiana.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2022Response to application from respondent Galmon filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 23 2022Response to application from respondent Press Robinson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 24 2022Reply of applicant Kyle Ardoin, Louisiana Secretary of State, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 28 2022Application (21A814) referred to the Court.
Jun 28 2022Application (21A814) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s June 6, 2022 preliminary injunctions in No. 3:22-CV-211 and No. 3:22- CV-214 are stayed. In addition, the application for stay is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The case is held in abeyance pending this Court’s decision in Merrill, AL Sec. of State, et al. v. Milligan, Evan, et al. (No. 21-1086 and No. 21-1087) or further order of the Court. The stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application for stay and dissent from the treatment of the application as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment and the granting of certiorari before judgment.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Kyle Ardoin, in his official capacity as the Louisiana Secretary of State, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Galmon Respondents
Stuart Charles Naifeh
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

snaifeh@naacpldf.org
(917) 574-5846
Party name: Press Robinson, et al.
Other
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
222 S. Main Street
5th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

tyler@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Members of U.S. House of Representatives from Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543