Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A772
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A772
Title:David Ritter, Applicant
v.
Linda Migliori, et al.
Docketed:May 27, 2022
Linked with 22-30
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1499)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2022Application (21A772) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 27 2022Response to application (21A772) requested by Justice Alito, due by noon (EDT), Tuesday, May 31st, 2022.
May 30 2022Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Applicant filed by Doctor Oz for Senate and Dr. Mehmet Oz.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
May 31 2022Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicant and the responses filed thereto, it is ordered that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, case No. 22-1499, is hereby stayed pending further order of Justice Alito or of the Court.
May 31 2022Response to application from Bonin, Adam C. Zac Cohen filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2022Response to application from respondent Linda Migliori, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2022Letter of respondent Lehigh County Board of Elections filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2022Reply of applicant David Ritter filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Supplemental letter on behalf of respondents filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2022Supplemental letter of applicant David Ritter filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2022Application (21A772) referred to the Court.
Jun 09 2022The application (21A772) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. The order heretofore entered by Justice Alito is vacated. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of the application for stay. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: David Ritter
Attorneys for Respondents
Ari Joseph Savitzky
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

asavitzky@aclu.org
2125492681
Party name: Linda Migliori, et al.
Lucas J. Repka
    Counsel of Record
108 E Center Street
Nazareth, PA 18064

lucas@repkamazinlaw.com
610-365-2670
Party name: Lehigh County Board of Elections
Other
John Matthew Gore
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jmgore@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Doctor Oz for Senate and Dr. Mehmet Oz
Adam C. Bonin
    Counsel of Record
The Law Office of Adam C Bonin
121 S Broad St, Suite 400
Philadelphia, PA 19107

adam@boninlaw.com
2672425014
Party name: Zac Cohen

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543