May 21 2022 | Application (21A756) for stay, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions |
May 21 2022 | Response to application (21A756) requested by Justice Alito, due by noon (EDT) on May 23, 2022. |
| |
May 23 2022 | Response to application from respondent United States filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
May 23 2022 | Response to application from respondents other than the United States filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document |
May 23 2022 | Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application For A Stay Pending Appeal or, in the Alterantive, Pending Disposition of a Petition For A Writ Of Mandamus filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
May 23 2022 | Reply of applicants Ryan Guillen, et al. filed. |
| ReplyProof of Service |
May 26 2022 | Second Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Emergency Application for A Stay Pending Appeal Or, In the Alternative Pending Disposition Of A Petition For Writ Of Mandamus filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
May 26 2022 | Supplemental memorandum on behalf of applicants filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
May 31 2022 | Application (21A756) referred to the Court. |
| |
May 31 2022 | Application (21A756) denied by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. |
| |