Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A720
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A720
Title:NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al., Applicants
v.
Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas
Docketed:May 13, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-51178)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2022Application (21A720) to vacate the stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 14 2022Response to application (21A720) requested by Justice Alito, due by 5 p.m. (EDT) May 18, 2022.
May 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Professor Eric Goldman.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae and Proposed Brief of Chamber of Progress et al. filed by Chamber of Progress, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae of TechFreedom filed by TechFreedom.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion for leave to file brief amicus curiae filed by Floor64, Inc. d/b/a the Copia Institute.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Emergency Application for Immediate Administrative Relief filed by Christopher Cox.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae and Proposed Brief filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 17 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae filed by Center for Democracy & Technology, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 18 2022Response to application from respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 18 2022Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae filed by State of Florida.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
May 18 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Philip Hamburger; Giganews Inc.; Golden Frog, GmBH.
Main DocumentMain Document
May 18 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae and Brief of the Cato Institute in Support of Applicants' Emergency Application to Vacate Stay filed by Cato Institute.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
May 19 2022Reply in support of emergency application filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 23 2022Letter of supplemental authority received.
Main DocumentMain Document
May 31 2022Application (21A720) referred to the Court.
May 31 2022The application (21A720) to vacate stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted. The May 11, 2022 order of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit staying the district court’s preliminary injunction is vacated. Justice Kagan would deny the application to vacate stay. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from grant of application to vacate stay. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lehotskykeller.com
(512) 693-8350
Party name: NetChoice, LLC d/b/a NetChoice; and Computer & Communications Industry Association d/b/a CCIA
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Ken Paxton, in his Official Capacity as Attorney General of Texas
Other
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

davidg@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology, et al.
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Chamber of Progress, et al.
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
(202) 842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: State of Florida
Arthur Raymond Kraatz
    Counsel of Record
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
365 Canal Street, Suite 2000
New Orleans, LA 70130

arthur.kraatz@phelps.com
5045849344
Party name: Christopher Cox
Mark William Brennan
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

mark.brennan@hoganlovells.com
2026376409
Party name: TechFreedom
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW
Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press et al.
Tod Cohen
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLC
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

tcohen@omm.com
4084108329
Party name: Professor Eric Goldman
Catherine Rachel Gellis
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
3020 Bridgeway #247
Sausalito, CA 94965

cathy@cgcounsel.com
2026422849
Party name: Floor64, Inc. d/b/a the Copia Institute
Shon Robert Hopwood
    Counsel of Record
Hopwood & Singhal PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

shonrhopwood@gmail.com
4028890588
Party name: Professor Philip Hamburger; Giganews Inc.; Golden Frog, GmBH

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543