Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A715
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A715
Title:Lady Donna Duchess, Applicant
v.
Jason Dutch
Docketed:May 13, 2022
Linked with 22-5408
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Alaska
   Case Numbers:(S-18109)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2022Application (21A715) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2022 to August 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
May 13 2022Application (21A715) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 6, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lady Donna Duchess6430 East Northern Lights
#8A
Anchorage, AK 99504

(760) 913-7773
Party name: Lady Donna Duchess

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543