Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A615
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A615
Title:Dipendra Tiwari, et al., Applicants
v.
Eric Friedlander, Secretary, Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, et al.
Docketed:April 18, 2022
Linked with 22-42
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-5495)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2022Application (21A615) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2022 to July 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Application (21A615) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 14, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Heller Ward
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

andrew.ward@ij.org
703-682-9320
Party name: Dipendra Tiwari, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543