Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A599
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A599
Title:Jonathan Dunn, Applicant
v.
Lloyd J. Austin III, Secretary of Defense, et al.
Docketed:April 12, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15286)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 11 2022Application (21A599) for Injunction Pending Appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 12 2022Motion for leave to file brief and brief for amici curiae Professor Todd Zywicki and Jeffrey Singer, M.D. filed by Professor Todd Zywicki and Jeffrey Singer, M.D.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Apr 12 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief and amici curiae brief filed by Mississippi, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Apr 13 2022Response to application (21A599) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 5 p.m. (EDT) on Friday, April 15th, 2022.
Apr 14 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief and brief for amicus curiae filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief and brief of amici curiae filed by Air Force Officer, Air Force NCO, Air Force Special Agent, and Air Force Engineer.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 15 2022Response to application from respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 15 2022Motion for leave to file brief and brief for amici curiae filed by retired general officers of the United States Armed Forces.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Application (21A599) referred to the Court.
Apr 18 2022Application (21A599) denied by the Court. The application for an injunction pending appeal presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is denied. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the application for an injunction pending appeal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Jaffe LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111

dfalk@schaerr-jaffe.com
650-269-2020
Party name: Jonathan Dunn
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: Mississippi, et al.
Frederick Richard Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
370 17th Street, Suite 4500
Denver, CO 80202

yarger@wtotrial.com
303-244-1800
Party name: Professor Todd Zywicki and Jeffrey Singer, M.D.
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Stephen M. Crampton
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
P.O. Box 4506
Tupelo, MS 38803

smcrampton@hotmail.com
6622559439
Party name: Air Force Officer, Air Force NCO, Air Force Special Agent, and Air Force Engineer
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Law Center
24 Frank Lloyd Wright Dr.
Suite J3200
Ann Arbor, MI 48106

emersino@thomasmore.org
734-827-2001
Party name: Retired General Officers of the United States Armed Forces

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543