Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A590
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A590
Title:Coalition for TJ, Applicant
v.
Fairfax County School Board, et al., Respondents
Docketed:April 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1280)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 08 2022Application (21A590) to vacate stay issued by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Response to application (21A590) requested by the Chief Justice, due by 5 p.m. on Wednesday, April 13, 2022.
Apr 11 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Liberty Justice Center.
Main DocumentOther
Apr 12 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief in support of Applicant filed by Commonwealth of Virginia.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 13 2022Response to application from respondent Fairfax County School Board filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 15 2022Reply of applicant Coalition for TJ filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Application (21A590) referred to the Court.
Apr 25 2022Application (21A590) denied by the Court. The application to vacate the stay presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is denied. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the application to vacate the stay.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

ewilcox@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Coalition for TJ
Attorneys for Respondent
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Fairfax County School Board
Other
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells St.
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Andrew Nathan Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

AFerguson@oag.state.va.us
8047867704
Party name: Commonwealth of Virginia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543