Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A539
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A539
Title:Louisiana, et al., Applicants
v.
American Rivers, et al.
Docketed:March 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-16958,21-16960,21-16961)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2022Application (21A539) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherOtherOtherOtherProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Response to application (21A539) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 3 p.m. on Monday, March 28, 2022.
Mar 28 2022Response to application from respondents American Rivers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Mar 28 2022Memorandum For the Federal Respondents in Oppostion filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2022Reply of applicants Louisiana, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Apr 06 2022Application (21A539) referred to the Court.
Apr 06 2022Application (21A539) granted by the Court. The application for a stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district court’s October 21, 2021 order, insofar as it vacates the current certification rule, 40 C.F.R. Part 121, is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such a writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Kagan, with whom The Chief Justice, Justice Breyer, and Justice Sotomayor join, dissents. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: State of Louisiana, State of Arkansas, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: American Rivers, American Whitewater, California Trout, Idaho Rivers United, Columbia Riverkeeper, Sierra Club, Suquamish Tribe, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Orutsararmiut Native Council, California, State Water Resources Control Board, Oregon, New Jersey, New York, Maryland, Rhode Island, Colorado, District of Columbia, North Carolina, New Mexico, Vermont, Minnesota, Connecticut, Washington, Michigan, Massachusetts, Nevada, Wisconsin, Maine, Illinois.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543