Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A490
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A490
Title:Glenn Grothman, United States Congressman, et al., Applicants
v.
Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2021AP1450)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2022Application (21A490) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Mar 10 2022Response to application (21A490) requested by Justice Barrett, due by 5 p.m. on Tuesday, March 15, 2022.
Mar 14 2022Response to application from respondents Wisconsin Elections Commission, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022Response to application from respondents Gary Krenz, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022Response to application from respondent Governor Tony Evers filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022Response to application from Hunter Respondents filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 16 2022Reply of applicants Congressman Glenn Grothman, et al. filed.
ReplyReplyProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Application (21A490) referred to the Court.
Mar 23 2022Application (21A490) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe, Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: Congressman Glenn Grothman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas Charles Bellavia
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street
PO Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

bellaviatc@doj.state.wi.us
6082668690
Party name: Wisconsin Elections Commission and its members, Marge Bostelmann, Julie Glancey, Ann Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert Spindell, Jr., and Mark Thomsen
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(929) 294-2537
Party name: Governor Tony Evers
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Gary Krenz, et al.
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Hunter Respondents
Other
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543