Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A457
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A457
Title:William C. Toth, Jr., et al., Applicants
v.
Leigh Chapman, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:February 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
   Case Numbers:(1:22-cv-00208)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022Application (21A457) for writ of injunction, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOther
Feb 28 2022Response to application (21A457) requested by Justice Alito, due by 5 p.m. on Thursday, March 3, 2022.
Mar 03 2022Response to application from respondents Chapman, Leigh M., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Response to application from Carol Ann Carter, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2022Reply of applicant William C. Toth, et al. filed.
Reply
Mar 07 2022Application (21A457) referred to the Court.
Mar 07 2022The application for writ of injunction presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court in No. 21A457 is denied. This case has now been referred to a three-judge court, and the parties may exercise their right to appeal from an order of that court granting or denying interlocutory injunctive relief.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: William C. Toth, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(929) 294-2537
Party name: Chapman, Leigh M., et al.
Other
Abha Khanna
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
1700 Seventh Ave
Suite 2100
Seattle, WA 98101

akhanna@elias.law
206-656-0177
Party name: Carol Ann Carter, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543