Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A375
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A375
Title:John H. Merrill, Alabama Secretary of State, et al., Applicants
v.
Evan Milligan, et al.
Docketed:January 28, 2022
Linked with 21-1086
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(2:21-cv-1530)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2022Application (21A375) for a stay or injunctive relief pending appeal, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 28 2022Response to application (21A375) requested by Justice Thomas, due by noon on Wednesday, February 2, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Louisiana, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by John Wahl, Chairman, Alabama State Republican Executive Committee.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by The National Republican Redistricting Trust.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by United States Representatives from Alabama. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Alabama Center for Law and Liberty. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 02 2022Response to application from respondents Evan Milligan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 02 2022Reply of applicants John Merrill, et al. filed.
ReplyReplyProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Application (21A375) referred to the Court.
Feb 07 2022Application (21A375) granted by the Court. The application is treated as a jurisdictional statement (No. 21-1086), and probable jurisdiction is noted. The district court's January 24, 2022 preliminary injunction in No. 2:21-cv-1530 is stayed pending further order of the Court. Justice Kavanaugh, with whom Justice Alito joins, concurring in grant of applications for stay. (Detached opinion). The Chief Justice dissenting from grant of applications for stay. (Detached opinion). Justice Kagan, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Sotomayor join, dissenting from grant of applications for stays. (Detached opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

edmund.lacour@alabamaag.gov
334-242-7300
Party name: John Merrill, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Leah Camille AdenNAACP Legal Defense and Ed. Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

laden@naacpldf.org
2129652200
Party name: Evan Milligan, et al.
Deuel Ross
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dross@naacpldf.org
212-965-7712
Party name: Evan Milligan, et al.
Other
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: States of LA, AR, AZ, GA, IN, KY, MS, MO, MT, OK, SC, TX, UT, WV
Albert Linch Jordan
    Counsel of Record
Wallace, Jordan, Ratliff & Brandt, LLC
800 Shades Creek Parkway
Suite 400
Birmingham, AL 35209

bjordan@wallacejordan.com
205-874-0305
Party name: John Wahl, Chairman, Alabama State Republican Executive Committee
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

jtorchinsky@holtzmanvogel.com
540 341 8808
Party name: The National Republican Redistricting Trust
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Christopher Ernest Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: United States Representatives from Alabama

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543