Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A329
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A329
Title:Marvin Gerber, Applicant
v.
Henry Herskovitz, et al.
Docketed:January 14, 2022
Linked with 21-1263
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1870)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2022Application (21A329) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Application (21A329) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 1, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: Marvin Gerber

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543