Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A247
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A247
Title:Ohio, et al., Applicants
v.
Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, et al.
Docketed:December 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-7000)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2021Application (21A247) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Response to application (21A247) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due by 4pm on Thursday, December 30, 2021.
Dec 20 2021Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief filed by Washington Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 22 2021Application (21A247) referred to the Court.
Dec 22 2021Consideration of the applications (21A244 and 21A247) for stay presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. The applications are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The applications are set for oral argument on Friday, January 7, 2022.
Dec 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Former OSHA Administrators Charles Jeffress, David Michaels, and Gerard Scannell. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Because the Court has consolidated these applications for oral argument, future filings and activity in 21A244 and 21A247 will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21A244. Subsequent filings in No. 21A244 and/or 21A247 must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21A244. Any document submitted in connection with either of these applications must include on its cover the application number and caption for each application in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in only one application, the docket entry will reflect that; a document filed in both applications will be noted as “VIDED.”
Dec 30 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of We The Patriots USA, Inc. not accepted for filing. (January 05, 2022) (Due to the consolidation of these cases, filings in No. 21A244 and/or 21A247 must be submitted through the electronic filing system in only No. 21A244.)
Dec 30 2021Response of United States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, et al. to application not accepted for filing. (January 05, 2022) (Due to the consolidation of these cases, filings in No. 21A244 and/or 21A247 must be submitted through the electronic filing system in only No. 21A244.)
Dec 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief of Small Business Majority, et al. not accepted for filing. (January 05, 2022) (Due to the consolidation of these cases, filings in No. 21A244 and/or 21A247 must be submitted through the electronic filing system in only No. 21A244.)
Jan 06 2022Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief of Alsco, Inc. not accepted for filing. (January 07, 2022) (Due to the consolidation of these cases, filings in No. 21A244 and/or 21A247 must be submitted through the electronic filing system in only No. 21A244.)
Jan 07 2022Argued. For applicants in 21A244: Scott A. Keller, Washington, D. C. For applicants in 21A247: Benjamin M. Flowers, Solicitor General, Columbus, Ohio. For respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. VIDED.
Jan 13 2022The applications for stays (21A244 & 21A247) presented to JUSTICE KAVANAUGH and by him referred to the Court are granted. OSHA’s COVID–19 Vaccination and Testing; Emergency Temporary Standard, 86 Fed. Reg. 61402, is stayed pending disposition of the applicants’ petitions for review in the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit and disposition of the applicants’ petitions for writs of certiorari, if such writs are timely sought. Should the petitions for writs of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petitions for writs of certiorari are granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Opinion per curiam. Gorsuch, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined. Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., filed a dissenting opinion. VIDED.
Jan 19 2022Motion to File and Amicus Brief of Foundation for Moral Law submitted.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Ohio, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, et al.
Other
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Former Osha Administrators Charles Jeffress, David Michaels, and Gerard Scannell
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Norman A. Pattis
    Counsel of Record
Pattis & Smith, LLC
383 Orange St
1st Floor
New Haven, CT 06511

npattis@pattisandsmith.com
203-393-3017
Party name: We The Patriots USA, Inc.
Richard Adam Koffman
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
1100 New York Ave NW Fifth Floor
Washington, DC, DC 20005

rkoffman@cohenmilstein.com
2024084674
Party name: Small Business Majority, et al.
David Peter Billings
    Counsel of Record
Fabian VanCott
215 South State Street, Suite 1200
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

dbillings@fabianvancott.com
801.323.2205
Party name: Alsco, Inc.
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543