Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A241
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A241
Title:Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Applicants
v.
Louisiana, et al.
Docketed:December 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-30734)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2021Application (21A241) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 17 2021Response to application (21A241) requested by Justice Alito, due by 4pm on Thursday, December 30, 2021.
Dec 21 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by American Medical Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 22 2021Application (21A241) referred to the Court.
Dec 22 2021Consideration of the application (No. 21A241) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. Consideration of the application (21A240) for stay presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. The applications are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The applications are set for oral argument on Friday, January 7, 2022.
Dec 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici curiae brief filed by Service Employees International Union, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Because the Court has consolidated these applications for oral argument, future filings and activity in 21A240 and 21A241 will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21A240. Subsequent filings must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21A240. Any document submitted in connection with either of these applications must include on its cover the application number and caption for each application in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in only one application, the docket entry will reflect that; a document filed in both applications will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 07 2022Argued. For applicants in 21A240 and 21A241: Brian H. Fletcher, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents in 21A240: Jesus A. Osete, Deputy Attorney General, Jefferson City, Mo. For respondents in 21A241: Elizabeth Murrill, Solicitor General, Baton Rouge, La. VIDED.
Jan 13 2022The applications for stay presented to JUSTICE ALITO (21A241) and JUSTICE KAVANAUGH (21A240) and by them referred to the Court are granted. The District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri’s November 29, 2021, order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit and the disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. The District Court for the Western District of Louisiana’s November 30, 2021, order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit and the disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this order shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the order shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Opinion per curiam. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, Gorsuch and Barrett, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, Gorsuch and Barrett, JJ., joined. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, et al.
Other
Jessica Anne Morton
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

jmorton@democracyforward.org
202-843-1642
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.
Barbara Jane Chisholm
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon LLP
177 Post Street, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

bchisholm@altber.com
4154217151
Party name: Service Employees International Union; American Federation of Teachers; and American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543