Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A22
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A22
Title:Protect Our Parks, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Pete Buttigieg, Secretary of Transportation, et al.
Docketed:August 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2449)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 17 2021Application (21A22) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Application (21A22) denied by Justice Barrett.
Aug 31 2021Application (21A22) refiled and submitted to The Chief Justice.
OtherOtherProof of Service
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 08 2021Application (21A22) referred to the Court.
Oct 04 2021Application (21A22) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Rachlis
    Counsel of Record
Rachlis Durham Duff and Adler.LLC
542 South Dearborn
Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60605

mrachlis@rdaplaw.net
3127333955
Party name: Protect Our Parks, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543