Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A217
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A217
Title:John Doe, et al., Applicants
v.
San Diego Unified School District, et al.
Docketed:December 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-56259)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2021Application (21A217) for an injunction, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 10 2021Response to application (21A217) requested by Justice Kagan, due Thursday, December 16, 2021, by 3 p.m.
Dec 16 2021Response to application from respondent San Diego Unified School District, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2021Reply of applicants John Doe, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Letter dated December 23, 2021 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Dec 26 2021Letter dated December 26, 2021 from counsel for respondents filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2022Letter dated January 4, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Jan 14 2022Letter dated January 14, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Feb 11 2022Letter dated February 11, 2022 from counsel for applicants filed.
Main Document
Feb 18 2022Application (21A217) referred to the Court.
Feb 18 2022Application (21A217) denied by the Court. The application for injunctive relief presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is denied in light of changed circumstances. Because respondents have delayed implementation of the challenged policy, and because they have not settled on the form any policy will now take, emergency relief is not warranted at this time. Applicants’ alternative request for a writ of certiorari before judgment and a stay pending resolution is denied for the same reason. The Court’s denial is without prejudice to applicants seeking a new injunction if circumstances warrant.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul Michael Jonna
    Counsel of Record
LiMandri & Jonna LLP
16236 San Dieguito Road, Suite 3-15
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

pjonna@limandri.com
8587599930
Party name: John Doe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Robert Bresee
    Counsel of Record
Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Rudd & Romo
4275 Executive Square, Suite 700
La Jolla, CA 92037

mbresee@aalrr.com
9492947439
Party name: San Diego Unified School District, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543