Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A145
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A145
Title:Dr. A., et al., Applicants
v.
Kathy Hochul, Governor of New York, et al.
Docketed:November 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2566)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2021Application (21A145) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Response to application (21A145) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Tuesday, November 16, by 4 p.m.
Nov 16 2021Response to application from respondents Kathy Hochul, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Sharon Fast Gustafson, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 17 2021Reply of applicants Dr. A., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by John Doe 1.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Nov 23 2021Letter of applicants Dr. A., et al. filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2021Application (21A145) referred to the Court.
Dec 13 2021Application (21A145) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas would grant the application. Justice Gorsuch, with whom Justice Alito joins, dissenting from the denial of application for injunctive relief. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas L. Brejcha
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 West Washington Street
Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Dr. A., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Kathy Hochul, et al.
Other
Rachel Nicole Morrison
    Counsel of Record
Ethics & Public Policy Center
1730 M Street, N.W.
Suite 910
Washington, DC 20036

rmorrison@eppc.org
202-682-1200
Party name: Former EEOC Employees and Title VII Religious Accommodation Experts
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: John Doe 1, President of Board of Faith-Based Senior Living Facility in New York

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543