Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A125
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A125
Title:We The Patriots USA, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Kathy Hochul, Governor of New York, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2179)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2021Application (21A125) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Nov 03 2021Response to application (21A125) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Wednesday, November 10, by 4 p.m.
Nov 09 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 10 2021Response to application from respondents Kathleen Hochul, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Public Health Associations and Scholars of Public Health.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 13 2021Application (21A125) referred to the Court.
Dec 13 2021Application (21A125) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Norman A. Pattis
    Counsel of Record
Suite 409
383 Orange St
Pattis & Smith, LLC
New Haven, CT 06511

npattis@pattisandsmith.com
203-393-3017
Party name: We The Patriots USA, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven Chiajon WuNew York Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

steven.wu@ag.ny.gov
2124166312
Party name: Kathleen Hochul, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Kathleen Hochul, et al.
Other
Alexander J. Luchenitser
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L St NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

luchenitser@au.org
202-466-7306
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Public Health Associations and Scholars of Public Health

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543