Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-998
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-998
Title:Daniel Bierbach, Petitioner
v.
Digger's Polaris, et al.
Docketed:January 13, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A20-1525)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Brief of respondents Digger's Polaris, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Reply of petitioner Daniel Bierbach filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
May 31 2022Supplemental brief of petitioner Daniel Bierbach filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Digger's Polaris, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Daniel Bierbach
Attorneys for Respondents
Susan KH Conley
    Counsel of Record
Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak & Pikala, P.A.
81 South Ninth Street, Suite 500
Minneapolis, MN 55402

skconley@arthurchapman.com
612-339-3500
Party name: Digger's Polaris, et al.
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Digger’s Polaris and State Auto/United Fire & Casualty Group
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543