Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-995
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-995
Title:Budha Jam, et al., Petitioners
v.
International Finance Corporation
Docketed:January 13, 2022
Linked with 21A124
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-7092, 20-7097)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2021Application (21A124) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 11, 2021 to December 27, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Application (21A124) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 27, 2021.
Dec 16 2021Application (21A124) to extend further the time from December 27, 2021 to January 10, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Application (21A124) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 10, 2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Budha Jam, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2022 to March 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2022.
Feb 14 2022Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for International Environmental Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Former United States Diplomats and International Development Practitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2022Brief of respondent International Finance Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2022Reply of petitioners Budha Jam, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law - Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jnewman@law.stanford.edu
6507247081
Party name: Budha Jam, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: International Finance Corporation
Other
Benjamin Daniel Battles
    Counsel of Record
Pollock Cohen LLP
60 Broad Street
24th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ben@pollockcohen.com
802-793-5512
Party name: Center for International Environmental Law
Douglass W. Cassel
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas
34th Floor
New York, NY 10036

Dcassel@kslaw.com
(212) 556-2100
Party name: Former United States Diplomats and International Development Practitioners
Beatrice Lisa Young Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School International Human Rights Clin
6 Everett St., Suite 3139
Cambridge, MA 02138

blindstrom@law.harvard.edu
6174959214
Party name: International Law Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543