Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-994
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-994
Vide 21-6952
Title:John Kapoor, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 13, 2022
Linked with 21A151
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1382, 20-1409)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2021Application (21A151) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 23, 2021 to January 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Application (21A151) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until January 10, 2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion of United States for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (February 02, 2022 - Corrected motion to be filed)
Feb 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2022 to March 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 16, 2022.
Mar 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2022 to April 15, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 15, 2022.
Apr 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2022 to April 29, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2022.
Apr 29 2022Brief of respondents United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2022Reply of petitioner John Kapoor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kosta Stanko Stojilkovic
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Stekloff LLP
2001 M Street NW, 10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

kstojilkovic@wilkinsonstekloff.com
(202) 847-4045
Party name: John Kapoor
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543