Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-990
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-990
Title:Aldrich L. Boss, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stewart R. Crane, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:January 12, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2061)
   Decision Date:October 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 07 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ernest Edward Badway
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
100 Park Avenue, Suite 1500
New York, NY 10017

ebadway@foxrothschild.com
12128787986
Party name: Aldrich Boss
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543