Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-985
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-985
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Gage Christopher J. Shriver
Docketed:January 11, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1276)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Jan 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Waiver of Gage Christopher J. Shriver of right to respond not accepted for filing. (January 26, 2022)
Jan 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Gage Christopher J. Shriver to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael D. Morehead
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Indigent Defense System
P.O. Box 926
Norman, OK 73070

Michael.Morehead@oids.ok.gov
405-801-2666
Party name: Gage Christopher J. Shriver
Other
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543