Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-984
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-984
Title:Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael J. Hewitt
Docketed:January 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20023)
   Decision Date:September 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 27 2022Letter of January 25, 2022 pertaining to the corporate discosure statement, received from counsel for the petiitoners.
Main Document
Feb 07 2022Letter of February 7, 2022 pertaining to amicus briefs, received from counsel for the petiitoners.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022Waiver of right of respondent Michael J. Hewitt to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas Oil and Gas Association, Inc. and The American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Independent Petroleum Association of America and Offshore Operators Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2022Brief amici curiae of Mississippi, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 18 2022Response Requested. (Due March 21, 2022)
Mar 21 2022Brief of respondent Michael J. Hewitt in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2022Reply of petitioners Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 02 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 06 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 26 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 07 2022May 26, 2022 motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 8, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2022.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, October, 12, 2022.
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 5th Circuit.
Jun 22 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jun 23 2022The record from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Texas (Houston) has been electronically filed.
Jul 08 2022Joint appendix filed (statement of cost filed.)
Main Document
Jul 08 2022Brief of petitioners Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2022Brief amicus curiae of Independent Petroleum Association of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2022Brief amici curiae of States of Mississippi, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas Oil and Gas Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Aug 31 2022Brief of respondent Michael J. Hewitt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Nurses Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Nurses United filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 28 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Helix Energy Solutions Group, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Charles Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

skaplan@bsfllp.com
7033715139
Party name: Michael J. Hewitt
Edwin SullivanOberti Sullivan LLP
712 Main Street, Suite 900
Houston, TX 77002

ed@osattorneys.com
(713) 401-3557
Party name: Michael J. Hewitt
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Matthew James Ginsburg
    Counsel of Record
American Fed. of Labor and Congress of Industrial
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mginsburg@aflcio.org
202-637-5397
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
David Bryce Jordan
    Counsel of Record
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
1301 McKinney Street, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010

djordan@littler.com
7139519400
Party name: Texas Oil and Gas Association, Inc. and The American Petroleum Institute
Robert P. Lombardi
    Counsel of Record
The Kullman Firm, P.L.C.
1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600
New Orleans, LA 70163

rpl@kullmanlaw.com
504-524-4162
Party name: Independent Petroleum Association of America and Offshore Operators Committee
Robert P. Lombardi
    Counsel of Record
The Kullman Firm, P.L.C.
1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600
New Orleans, LA 70163

rpl@kullmanlaw.com
504-524-4162
Party name: Independent Petroleum Association of America
John R. Mooney
    Counsel of Record
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy, & Welch, P.C.
1920 L Street NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

jmooney@mooneygreen.com
2027830010
Party name: National Nurses United
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Scott Grant Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 220
Jackson, MS 39205-0220

scott.stewart@ago.ms.gov
(601) 359-5563
Party name: States of Mississippi, et al.
Nicholas David Wanger
    Counsel of Record
McDonald Lamond Canzoneri
352 Turnpike Road, Suite 210
Soutborough, MA 01772-1756

nwanger@masslaborlawyers.com
(508) 485-6600
Party name: Massachusetts Nurses Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543