Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-974
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-974
Vide 21-800
Title:Sylvia Borunda Firth, et al., Petitioners
v.
Tony K. McDonald, et al.
Docketed:January 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50448)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2022 to February 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2022.
Feb 28 2022Brief of respondents Tony McDonald, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 14 2022Reply of petitioners Sylvia Firth, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 04 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas S. Leatherbury
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2001 Ross Ave.
Suite 3900
Dallas, TX 75201

tleatherbury@velaw.com
(214) 220-7792
Party name: Sylvia Firth, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: Tony McDonald, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543