Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-968
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-968
Title:Fairfax County School Board, Petitioner
v.
Jane Doe
Docketed:January 6, 2022
Linked with 21A157
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2203)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2021Application (21A157) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2021 to January 13, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Application (21A157) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 13, 2022.
Dec 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2022 to April 8, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2022.
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Virginia School Boards Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2022Brief of respondent Jane Doe in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Reply of petitioner Fairfax County School Board filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Jun 02 2022Supplemental brief of respondent Jane Doe filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
(804) 788-7202
Party name: Fairfax County School Board
Attorneys for Respondent
Alexandra Zoe Brodsky
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L Street, N.W. Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

abrodsky@publicjustice.net
202-914-0481
Party name: Jane Doe
Other
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
501 Fayetteville St.
Suite 500
Raleigh, NC 27601

jellis@mcguirewoods.com
919-755-6688
Party name: Virginia School Boards Association, North Carolina School Boards Association, and South Carolina School Boards Association
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3100
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543