Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-966
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-966
Title:New York, et al., Petitioners
v.
Janet L. Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:January 6, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3962)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 7, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2022 to March 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 9, 2022.
Mar 09 2022Brief of respondents Janet L. Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Mar 23 2022Reply of petitioners of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Yellen, Sec. of Treasury, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543