Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-962
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-962
Title:In Re Whole Woman's Health, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:January 4, 2022
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2022Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due February 3, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of mandamus filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Jan 18 2022Letter from counsel for petitioners regarding court of appeals' certification order filed.
Main Document
Jan 20 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer, with whom Justice Sotomayor and Justice Kagan join, dissenting from denial of mandamus. (Detached Opinion) Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Kagan join, dissenting from denial of mandamus. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Marc Andrew Hearron
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
1634 Eye St NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

mhearron@reprorights.org
202-524-5539
Party name: Whole Woman's Health, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543