Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-961
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-961
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Patrick Wayne Olive
Docketed:December 30, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2019-496)
   Decision Date:September 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 07 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543