Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-960
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-960
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Jessy Shay Bailey
Docketed:December 30, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2020-226)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2022Brief amicus curiae of Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 23 2022Response Requested. (Due March 25, 2022)
Mar 25 2022Brief of respondent Jessy Shay Bailey in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
James L. HankinsMon Abri Business Center
2524 N. Broadway
Edmond, OK 73034

jameshankins@ocdw.com
405-753-4150
Party name: Jessy Shay Bailey
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543