Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-959
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-959
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Joshua Lee Purdom
Docketed:December 30, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2019-854)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 31, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Brief of respondent Joshua Lee Purdom in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Joshua Lee Purdom.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Joshua Lee Purdom

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543