Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-954
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-954
Title:Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Texas, et al.
Docketed:December 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-10806)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2022 to February 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2022Response to motion to extend the time to file a response filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response DENIED.
Jan 28 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jan 28 2022Brief of respondents Texas, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 02 2022Reply of petitioners Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 18 2022Petition GRANTED. The case will be set for argument in the second week of the April 2022 argument session. Petitioners' brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Monday, March 14, 2022. Respondents' brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Thursday, April 7, 2022. The reply brief is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Wednesday, April 20, 2022.
Mar 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 14 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Texas
Blanket Consent
Mar 14 2022Brief of petitioners Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 14 2022Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, April 26, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Benjamin Eidelson filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Former Officials of the Department of Homeland Security and the Immigration and Naturalization Service filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Former DHS Secretary Jeh C. Johnson and Former Ambassador to Mexico Roberta S. Jacobson filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of State of Illinois, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Immigration Law and Policy, UCLA School of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of The Border Project and the National Immigrant Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of 61 Immigration Advocacy and Legal Service Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2022Brief amici curiae of 25 Cities and Counties filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Record from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 23 2022Record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas (Amarillo) has been electronically filed.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Apr 07 2022Brief of respondent Texas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Immigration Studies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crime filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Advancing American Freedom filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2022Reply of petitioner Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 25 2022Letter from the Solicitor General noting statistical corrections to reports cited in their petition filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 26 2022Argued. For petitioners: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.
May 02 2022The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing the following questions: (1) Whether 8 U. S. C. §1252(f)(1) imposes any jurisdictional or remedial limitations on the entry of injunctive relief, declaratory relief, or relief under 5 U. S. C. §706. (2) Whether such limitations are subject to forfeiture. (3) Whether this Court has jurisdiction to consider the merits of the questions presented in this case. The briefs, not to exceed 6,000 words, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 5 p.m., Monday, May 9, 2022. Amicus curiae briefs, not to exceed 3,000 words, may be filed with the Clerk and served upon counsel on or before 5 p.m., Monday, May 9, 2022. Reply briefs, not to exceed 3,000 words, are to be filed simultaneously with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 5 p.m., Friday, May 13, 2022.
May 05 2022Supplemental amicus curiae brief of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
May 09 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 09 2022Supplemental brief of respondents Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2022Supplemental amici curiae brief of Indiana, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2022Supplemental amicus curiae brief of America First Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2022Supplemental amicus curiae brief of National Immigrant Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 09 2022Supplemental amicus curiae brief of American Civil Liberties Union in support of neither party filed. (To Be Recovered) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 09 2022Supplemental amicus curiae brief of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2022Supplemental reply brief for respondents Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
May 13 2022Supplemental reply brief of petitioners Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 06 2022Letter from the Solicitor General providing update regarding statistical corrections to reports cited in their petition filed. (Distributed)
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Missouri
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Utah, Virginia, and West Virginia
Charles G. Roth
    Counsel of Record
National Immigration Justice Center
224 S. Michigan Ave., Ste. 600
Chicago, IL 60604

croth@heartlandalliance.org
3126601613
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center
Michael King Thomas Tan
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad St., 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

mtan@aclu.org
212-519-7848
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union
Julie B. Axelrod
    Counsel of Record
Center for Immigration Studies
1629 K Street NW
Suite 600
Washington DC, DC 20006

jba@cis.org
2024668185
Party name: Center for Immigration Studies
Anjan Choudhury
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
350 S. Grand Avenue, 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

anjan.choudhury@mto.com
213-683-9107
Party name: Center for Immigration Law and Policy, UCLA School of Law
Ethan Douglas Dettmer
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
555 Mission Street, Suite 3000
San Francisco, CA 94105

edettmer@gibsondunn.com
(415) 393-8306
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Victoria Dorfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

vdorfman@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The Border Project and the National Immigrant Justice Center
Benjamin Micah Eidelson
    Counsel of Record
1525 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 01238

beidelson@law.harvard.edu
617-495-4846
Party name: Professor Benjamin Eidelson
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Utah, Virginia, and West Virginia
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Bipartisan Former Officials of the Department of Homeland Security and the Immigration and Naturalization Service
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Gene Patrick Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
America First Legal Foundation
300 Independence Avenue
Washington, DC 20003

gene.hamilton@aflegal.org
202-964-3721
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: Administrative Law Professors
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

njoshi@citizen.org
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

Jane.Notz@ilag.gov
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois, et al.
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
2027804848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom
Moses Silverman
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

msilverman@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Former DHS Secretary Jeh C. Johnson and Former Ambassador to Mexico Roberta S. Jacobson
Daniel Ramsey Suvor
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
400 So. Hope Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071

dsuvor@omm.com
213-430-6000
Party name: 25 Cities and Counties
Karen C. Tumlin
    Counsel of Record
Justice Action Center
P.O. Box 27280
Los Angeles, CA 90027

Karen.Tumlin@justiceactioncenter.org
323-450-7271
Party name: 61 Immigration Advocacy and Legal Service Organizations
Walter Stephen Zimolong III
    Counsel of Record
Zimolong LLC
P.O. Box 552
Villanova, PA 19085

wally@zimolonglaw.com
215-665-0842
Party name: Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crime

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543