Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-951
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-951
Title:Rio Grande Foundation, Petitioner
v.
City of Santa Fe, New Mexico, et al.
Docketed:December 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2022)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2022 to March 4, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2022.
Mar 03 2022Brief of respondents Santa Fe, New Mexico, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 22 2022Reply of petitioner Rio Grande Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Rio Grande Foundation
Attorneys for Respondents
Marcos Domenico Martinez
    Counsel of Record
City of Santa Fe, City Attorney's Office
200 Lincoln Avenue
Santa Fe, NM 87501

mdmartinez@santafenm.gov
505-955-6502
Party name: Santa Fe, New Mexico, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543