Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-943
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-943
Title:Gerald G. Lundergan, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5890)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gerald G. Lundergan
Blanket Consent
Jan 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2022 to February 25, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 25, 2022.
Feb 16 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2022 to March 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 17 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 28, 2022.
Mar 28 2022Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 13 2022Reply of petitioner Gerald G. Lundergan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Gerald G. Lundergan
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543