Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-936
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-936
Title:United States, et al., ex rel. Cathy Owsley, Petitioner
v.
Fazzi Associates, Inc., et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4240)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2022Waiver of right of respondents Care Connection of Cincinnati, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 06 2022Waiver of right of respondent Fazzi Associates, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 18 2022Response Requested. (Due February 17, 2022)
Feb 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 17, 2022 to April 1, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2022, for all respondents.
Apr 01 2022Brief of respondents Fazzi Associates, Inc. et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
Apr 20 2022Reply of petitioners Owsley, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
2026293530
Party name: Owsley, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stuart M Gerson
    Counsel of Record
Epstein Becker & Green P.C.
1227 25th Street, N.W.
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20037

sgerson@ebglaw.com
2028614180
Party name: Care Connection of Cincinnati, LLC, et al.
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Fazzi Associates, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543