Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-933
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-933
Title:Vdare Foundation, Petitioner
v.
City of Colorado Springs, Colorado
Docketed:December 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1162)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 24, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph David Sibley IV
    Counsel of Record
Camara & Sibley, LLP
1108 Lavaca St
Ste 110263
Austin, TX 78701

sibley@camarasibley.com
7138980494
Party name: Vdare Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543