Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-926
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-926
Title:Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, Petitioner
v.
Tyrance McCall
Docketed:December 22, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
   Case Numbers:(S20G1368)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Cooper Tire & Rubber Co.
Blanket Consent
Jan 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2022 to February 21, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2022Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2022. See Rule 30.1.
Jan 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2022Amicus brief of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meir Feder
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281

mfeder@jonesday.com
(212) 326-3939
Party name: Cooper Tire & Rubber Co.
Attorneys for Respondent
William K. Owens Jr.Conley Griggs Partin LLP
4200 Northside PKWY, NW
Building One, Suite 300
Atlanta, GA 30327-3007

will@conleygriggs.com
404-467-1155
Party name: Tyrance McCall
Other
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006-2706

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-626-2627
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543