Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-923
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-923
Title:Delila Pacheco, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:December 22, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2020-635)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Delila Pacheco

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543